EP1529429 - Protection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GKN Walterscheid GmbH Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE | [2005/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herchenbach, Paul Rathausstrasse 14 53809 Ruppichteroth / DE | 02 /
Coenen, Herbert Vinxeler Strasse 74 53639 Königswinter / DE | 03 /
Stommel, Markus Hohenzollernstrasse 108 53721 Siegburg / DE | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | Harwardt, Günther, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | Harwardt, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Harwardt Neumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Brandstrasse 10 53721 Siegburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04023863.6 | 07.10.2004 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | DE2003152162 | 05.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10352162 | [2005/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1529429 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529429 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01B71/08, F16D3/84 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
F16D3/841 (EP,US);
A01B71/08 (EP,US);
Y10S56/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2006/26] |
Former [2005/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | LT | 24.09.2005 | LV | 24.09.2005 | Title | German: | Schutzanordnung | [2005/19] | English: | Protection device | [2005/19] | French: | Dispositif de protection | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 21.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/43] | IT | 28.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3223864 (BONDIOLI EDI [IT]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0802342 (BENZI & DI TERLIZZI [IT]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US5971858 (AURORA IGINO [IT]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0116501 (AGRITRANS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE10153822 (WALTERSCHEID GMBH GKN [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * |