EP1650104 - Steering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Lenksysteme GmbH Richard-Bullinger-Strasse 77 73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Johannes Ipfweg 17 73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2006/17] | Application number, filing date | 04024261.2 | 12.10.2004 | [2006/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1650104 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
B62D5/30 (EP);
B60K28/10 (EP);
B62D5/0484 (EP);
B60W2050/143 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Title | German: | Lenksystem | [2006/17] | English: | Steering system | [2006/17] | French: | Système de direction | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/28] | 19.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.12.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0856453 (CLAAS OHG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,6,10,11 * column 9, line 36 - line 46 *; | [YA]US6070692 (NISHINO KAZUHISA [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,5-11 * column 10, line 24 - line 32 * [A] 1; | [YD]DE10019152 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 1,2,5-11 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 14 *; | [Y]DE19929428 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5-10 * column 9, line 36 - line 45 *; | [Y]DE10053335 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-11 * paragraphs [0040] , [0054] *; | [Y]WO03018361 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [Y] 1,5-11* paragraph [0064] * |