EP1647213 - Bed with a manual switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/16] | Manual switch for a bed | ||
[2016/16] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Change - English title | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | 08.07.2022 | Change - French title | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | 08.07.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wissner-Bosserhoff GmbH Hauptstrasse 6 58739 Wickede / DE | [2022/32] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Wissner-Bosserhoff GmbH Hauptstrasse 6 D-58739 Wickede / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deckert, Uwe Krinkelweg 57B 44267 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
Severin, Ludger Herbstweg 5A 59494 Soest / DE | 03 /
Vermeersch, Laurent Kattenbusch 35 59757 Arnsberg / DE | 04 /
Bernal, Carlos Ebehard-Viegener-Weg 17 59494 Soest / DE | [2016/37] |
Former [2006/16] | 01 /
Deckert, Uwe Krinkelweg 57B 44267 Dortmund / DE | ||
02 /
Severin, Ludger Herbstweg 5A 59494 Soest / DE | |||
03 /
Vermeersch, Laurent Kattenbusch 35 59757 Arnsberg / DE | |||
04 /
Bernal, Carlos Ebeh.-Viesener-Weg 17 59494 Soest / DE | Representative(s) | Graefe, Jörg, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 1580 59705 Arnsberg / DE | [2016/37] |
Former [2006/16] | Graefe, Jörg, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ostentor 9 59757 Arnsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04024281.0 | 12.10.2004 | [2006/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1647213 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1647213 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/37] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1647213 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47C20/04, H01H9/02 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
A47C31/008 (EP);
H01H9/0214 (EP);
A61G2203/12 (EP);
H01H2300/038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2006/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bett mit einem Handschalter | [2016/16] | English: | Bed with a manual switch | [2022/32] | French: | Lit avec un commutateur manuel | [2022/32] |
Former [2006/16] | Handschalter für ein Bett | ||
Former [2006/16] | Manual switch for a bed | ||
Former [2006/16] | Interrupteur manuel pour un lit | Examination procedure | 10.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2005 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 15.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.06.2017
26.06.2017
ADMISSIBLE Linak A/S Smedevænget 8 Guderup 6430 Nordborg / DK Opponent's representative Høyer, Michael Linak A/S Corporate IP Anker Engelunds Vej 11 9200 Aalborg SV / DK | [2021/47] |
Former [2021/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.06.2017
26.06.2017
ADMISSIBLE Linak A/S Smedevænget 8 Guderup 6430 Nordborg / DK Opponent's representative Inspicos P/S Kogle Allé 2 2970 Hørsholm / DK | ||
Former [2017/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.06.2017
ADMISSIBLE Linak A/S Smedevænget 8 Guderup 6430 Nordborg / DK Opponent's representative Høyer, Michael LINAK A/S Patent Department P.O. Box 238 9100 Aalborg / DK | 20.07.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.11.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.09.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.06.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 12.04.2019 | Appeal received No. T1144/19 | 14.06.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.09.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 26.10.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 28.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2004 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | PL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | IE | 12.10.2016 | LU | 12.10.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | PT | 16.01.2017 | ES | 13.10.2019 | [2021/25] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.10.2004 | |
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
TR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.10.2004 | |
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 14.09.2016 | |
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2696384 (FAURE BERTRAND AUTOMOBILE [FR]) [X] 1,4-6* page 7, line 29 - page 9, line 3; figure 2 *; | [XA]FR2737686 (FAURE BERTRAND EQUIPEMENTS SA [FR]) [X] 1-6 * figures 1,3-5 * * page 3, line 2 - page 5, line 28 * * page 5, line 29 - line 33 * * page 6, line 14 - page 12, line 12 * [A] 7,8; | [X]US2002111701 (BORDERS RICHARD L [US]) [X] 1,4-8 * paragraphs [0093] , [0094]; figures 28-33 *; | [X]US2004108192 (SCHNEIDER JOHANNES [DE]) [X] 1,4-8 * paragraphs [0003] - [0009] - [0012] - [0025] - [0035] - [0051]; figures 1,3,5 * | Examination | DE102005031820 | Opposition | FR2696384 | FR2737686 | US2002111701 | DE20207648U | US2004108192 |