EP1495781 - Cartridge for a device for targeted epithelial delivery of medicinal and related agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunfield, John Stephen 1325 NW Heather Drive Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 02 /
Ayres, James W. 1173 Charlemagne Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04024400.6 | 09.10.2003 | [2005/02] | Priority number, date | US20030394613 | 21.03.2003 Original published format: US 394613 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1495781 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1495781 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M35/00, A61M37/00 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
A45D34/04 (EP,US);
A63C17/067 (KR);
A45D44/00 (EP,US);
A61M35/00 (EP,US);
A61M37/00 (EP,US);
A63C17/068 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/27] |
Former [2005/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Methode und Vorrichtung zur gezielten Verabreichung von medizinischen Wirkstoffen oder dgl. | [2005/02] | English: | Cartridge for a device for targeted epithelial delivery of medicinal and related agents | [2005/02] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour délivrer de manière visée des agents médicaux où similaires | [2005/02] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 26.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/24] | 19.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03022940.5 / EP1459782 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5405614 (D ANGELO JOSEPH P [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 3 * * column 8, line 44 - column 9, line 11; figures 1,4-5c,8,9,12 *; | [X]WO9853777 (GUMASTE ANAND V [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 7, line 11 - page 8, line 7 * * page 12, line 3 - line 7 * * page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 14; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5980934 (REBER WILLIAM L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6221051 (HJERTMAN BIRGER [SE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 23 - line 33 * * column 2, line 1 - line 34 ** column 21, line 46 - column 22, line 53; figures 1-3 * |