EP1647276 - Use of taurolidine formulations for the intramammary treatment of mastitis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Vetmedica GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muellner, Hubert Staufenstr. 1 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 02 /
Daemmgen, Juergen Hattenburg Mittelbucherstrasse 1/2 88416 Ochsenhausen / DE | 03 /
Kron, Alexander Am Immensoll 43 19057 Schwerin / DE | 04 /
Folger, A. Martin Eisanacher Str. 18 55218 Ingelheim / DE | [2006/16] | Application number, filing date | 04024440.2 | 14.10.2004 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1647276 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/549, A61P31/04 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/549 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/52] |
Former [2006/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung von Taurolidin-Zubereitungen zur intramammären Behandlung von Mastitis | [2006/16] | English: | Use of taurolidine formulations for the intramammary treatment of mastitis | [2006/16] | French: | Utilisation de formulations à base de taurolidine dans le traitement intramammaire de la mammite | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/31] | 28.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.11.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3423408 (PFIRRMANN ROLF WILHELM) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1304111 (GEISTLICH SOEHNE AG [CH]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [DA] - SCHWEIZER ARCHIV FÜR TIERHEILKUNDE, (1985), vol. 127, pages 449 - 460, XP008044124 [DA] 1-9 * page 450, paragraph L * |