EP1526248 - Tape drum for a darkening device, like a roller shutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARCA Beteiligungen GmbH Buschkamp 7 46414 Rhede / DE | [2006/43] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Rademacher, Wilhelm Ulmenweg 3 46414 Rhede / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rademacher, Wilhelm Ulmenweg 3 46414 Rhede / DE | [2006/43] |
Former [2005/17] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Gottschald, Jan Gottschald Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Klaus-Bungert-Straße 1 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Gottschald, Jan Patentanwaltskanzlei Gottschald Kaiserwerther Markt 33 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/17] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04024494.9 | 14.10.2004 | [2005/17] | Priority number, date | DE2003216494U | 24.10.2003 Original published format: DE 20316494 U | [2005/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1526248 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1526248 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1526248 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/78 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
E06B9/68 (EP);
E06B9/70 (EP);
E06B9/78 (EP);
E06B9/88 (EP);
E06B2009/6818 (EP);
E06B2009/785 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Title | German: | Gurtwickler für eine Verdunkelungsvorrichtung wie einen Rolladen | [2005/17] | English: | Tape drum for a darkening device, like a roller shutter | [2005/17] | French: | Enrouleur de sangle pour un dispositif d'occultation comme un volet roulant | [2005/17] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.05.2008 | CZ | 21.05.2008 | DK | 21.05.2008 | EE | 21.05.2008 | FI | 21.05.2008 | IE | 21.05.2008 | PL | 21.05.2008 | RO | 21.05.2008 | SI | 21.05.2008 | SK | 21.05.2008 | TR | 21.05.2008 | BG | 21.08.2008 | SE | 21.08.2008 | GR | 22.08.2008 | ES | 01.09.2008 | AT | 14.10.2008 | GB | 14.10.2008 | PT | 21.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | HU | 22.11.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 21.05.2008 | |
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
TR | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
AT | 14.10.2008 | ||
GB | 14.10.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
HU | 22.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 21.05.2008 | |
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
AT | 14.10.2008 | ||
GB | 14.10.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
HU | 22.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
AT | 14.10.2008 | ||
GB | 14.10.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
GB | 14.10.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | DK | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 21.05.2008 | |
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 21.05.2008 | |
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 21.05.2008 | |
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 21.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3355149 (HANS WIEGELMANN, et al) [Y] 1,2,4,8-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3241123 (GREIS RICHARD) [Y] 1,2,4-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]AU560693B (BAXTER N L) [Y] 1,2,4-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5222327 (FELLOWS DONNA M [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-7 * column 4, line 46 - line 64; figure - *; | [A]DE29810297U (HALLER KLAUS [DE]) [A] 3* page 6, paragraph 2; figure - * | by applicant | DE1920660U | DE29810297U | EP0924379 | DE19805158 |