EP1647556 - Peptidic compounds and derivatives thereof for the treatment of human diseases through inhibition of signaling via growth factors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Kaiserstrasse 12 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Herrmann-von-Helmholtz-Platz 1 76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states TopoTarget Germany AG Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 42-44 60596 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
For all designated states Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Herrmann-von-Helmholtz-Platz 1 76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hentsch, Bernd Gaissacherstrasse 20 81371 München / DE | 02 /
Ponta, Helmut Ringstrasse 55 76356 Weingarten / DE | 03 /
Herrlich, Peter A. Vogelsang 8 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | 04 /
Matzke, Alexandra Brendstrasse 81 75179 Pforzheim / DE | 05 /
Orian-Rousseau, Veronique Rue de Betschdorf 22 67690 Rittershoffen / FR | 06 /
Adam, Jan Adlerstrasse 42 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [2008/44] |
Former [2006/16] | 01 /
Hentsch, Bernd Gervinusstrasse 8 60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
02 /
Ponta, Helmut Ringstrasse 55 76356 Weingarten / DE | |||
03 /
Herrlich, Peter A. Vogelsang 8 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
04 /
Matzke, Alexandra Brendstrasse 81 75179 Pforzheim / DE | |||
05 /
Orian-Rousseau, Veronique Rue de Betschdorf 22 67690 Rittershoffen / FR | |||
06 /
Adam, Jan Adlerstrasse 42 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Representative(s) | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04024507.8 | 14.10.2004 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1647556 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1647556 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/08, A61K38/08, G01N33/00, A61K38/04, A61K38/10 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/70585 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Extension states | AL | 28.09.2006 | HR | 28.09.2006 | LT | 28.09.2006 | LV | 28.09.2006 | MK | 28.09.2006 | Title | German: | Peptidische Verbindungen und deren Ableitungen für die Behandllung von menschlichen Krankheiten durch Hemmung der Signalübertragung über Wachstumfaktoren | [2006/16] | English: | Peptidic compounds and derivatives thereof for the treatment of human diseases through inhibition of signaling via growth factors | [2006/16] | French: | Composés et dérivés peptidiques pour le traitement de maladies humaines par inhibition de la transmission du signal par des facteurs de croissances | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 13.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.05.2010 | CZ | 19.05.2010 | EE | 19.05.2010 | FI | 19.05.2010 | PL | 19.05.2010 | RO | 19.05.2010 | SI | 19.05.2010 | SK | 19.05.2010 | TR | 19.05.2010 | BG | 19.08.2010 | GR | 20.08.2010 | PT | 20.09.2010 | LU | 14.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | HU | 20.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
TR | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
LU | 14.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
LU | 14.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 19.05.2010 | |
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CY | 19.05.2010 | |
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 19.05.2010 | |
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | FI | 19.05.2010 | |
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 19.05.2010 | |
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | FI | 19.05.2010 | |
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | FI | 19.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003069181 (WONG ALBERT J [US]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X]EP1391213 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X] - ORIAN-ROUSSEAU VÉRONIQUE ET AL, "CD44 is required for two consecutive steps in HGF/c-Met signaling.", GENES & DEVELOPMENT. 1 DEC 2002, (20021201), vol. 16, no. 23, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 3074 - 3086, XP002326889 [X] 1,2,18-20 * page 3078, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.242602 | [X] - LACKNER CAROLIN ET AL, "Soluble CD44 v5 and v6 in serum of patients with breast cancer. Correlation with expression of CD44 v5 and v6 variants in primary tumors and location of distant metastasis", BREAST CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, (199801), vol. 47, no. 1, ISSN 0167-6806, pages 29 - 40, XP002326890 [X] 1,2,18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1005913514376 | Examination | - A. MATZKE, ET AL., "A five-amino acid peptide blocks Met and Ron-dependent cell migration", CANCER RESEARCH, (20050715), vol. 64, no. 14, pages 6105 - 6110 | by applicant | - MORRISON ET AL., GENES DEV, (2001), vol. 15, pages 968 - 80 |