EP1533820 - Switch with a lockable rocker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITW Befestigungssysteme GmbH Gutenbergstrasse 4 91522 Ansbach / DE | [2006/26] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states ITW Befestigungssysteme GmbH Gutenbergstrasse 4 91522 Ansbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biersack, Horst Weinbergstrasse 16 91623 Sachsen / DE | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Blaumeier, Jörg Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Blaumeier, Jörg Lindner, Blaumeier & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 119109 90101 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04024897.3 | 20.10.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | DE2003155102 | 24.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10355102 | [2005/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533820 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1533820 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/20 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
H01H3/20 (EP);
H01H9/00 (KR);
H01H5/00 (KR);
H01H9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Title | German: | Schalter mit verriegelbarer Schaltwippe | [2005/21] | English: | Switch with a lockable rocker | [2005/21] | French: | Interrupteur avec bascule de commutation verrouillable | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 28.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.06.2006 | CZ | 28.06.2006 | EE | 28.06.2006 | FI | 28.06.2006 | PL | 28.06.2006 | RO | 28.06.2006 | SI | 28.06.2006 | SK | 28.06.2006 | TR | 28.06.2006 | BG | 28.09.2006 | DK | 28.09.2006 | SE | 28.09.2006 | GR | 29.09.2006 | LU | 20.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | HU | 29.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
PL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
TR | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
LU | 20.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
HU | 29.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
PL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
HU | 29.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
PL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
PL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
PL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
PL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
PL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
PL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
PL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 28.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1947014 (MARQUARDT J & J) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [X]DE3638952 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]EP0369221 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US5095181 (OSIKA THOMAS F [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 4 *; | [A]DE10028916 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |