EP1528171 - Wood-Concrete composite system comprising wooden construction elements, intermediate layers and concrete construction elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bathon, Leander Oberer Linsenberg 2 63864 Glattbach / DE | For all designated states Bathon, Tobias Oberer Linsenberg 2 63864 Glattbach / DE | [2005/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bathon, Tobias Oberer Linsenberg 2 63864 Glattbach / DE | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Nitz, Astrid Goethestrasse 23 63739 Aschaffenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | Thürer, Andreas Goldbacher Strasse 14 63739 Aschaffenburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/41] | Thürer, Andreas Goldbacher Strasse 14 63739 Aschaffenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04024931.0 | 20.10.2004 | [2005/18] | Priority number, date | DE20032016376U | 23.10.2003 Original published format: DE 20316376 U | DE20031051989 | 07.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10351989 | [2005/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1528171 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1528171 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1528171 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E04B5/23, E04C2/52, E04C2/26 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
E04C5/07 (EP,US);
E04B5/02 (EP,US);
E04B5/04 (EP,US);
E04B5/12 (EP,US);
E04B5/23 (EP,US);
E04B5/38 (EP,US);
E04B5/48 (EP,US);
E04C2/26 (EP,US);
E04C2/296 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [2006/07] | |||
Former [2005/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Holz-Beton-Verbundsysteme aus Holzbauteilen, Zwischenschichten und Betonbauteilen | [2005/18] | English: | Wood-Concrete composite system comprising wooden construction elements, intermediate layers and concrete construction elements | [2005/18] | French: | Système de construction composite bois-béton comportant des éléments de construction en bois, des couches intermédiaires et éléments de construction en béton | [2016/01] |
Former [2005/18] | Système de construction composite bois-béton comportant des éléments de construction en bois, des couches intermédiaires et éléments de construction en béton | Examination procedure | 06.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2006 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 30.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.12.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.01.2006 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 11.01.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.01.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.02.2007 | 31.10.2013 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2004 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | ES | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | IT | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | NL | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | IE | 20.10.2016 | LU | 20.10.2016 | BE | 31.10.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.10.2004 | |
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 20.10.2016 | ||
LU | 20.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 31.08.2016 | |
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 20.10.2016 | ||
LU | 20.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 31.08.2016 | |
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
LU | 20.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 31.08.2016 | |
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 31.08.2016 | |
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 31.08.2016 | |
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | ES | 31.08.2016 | |
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH687213 (SILVATECH AG [CH]) [Y] 11,12 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 10; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE29616375U (HOLZBAU BECKER & SOHN GMBH [DE]) [A] 9-13* figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE19805088 (HESCHELER [DE]) [Y] 16 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0952271 (BAUER WERNER [DE]) [Y] 5,7,24 * paragraph [0012]; figure 1 *; | [XY]DE20119279U (BAUER WERNER [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 7; | [XY]DE20210714U (BAUER WERNER [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,9,10,14,15,17-19,21,25,26 * the whole document * [Y] 5,7,11,12,16,24; | [Y]AT5773U (PIRNBACHER GEORG ING [AT]) [Y] 7 * abstract * |