EP1500564 - Vehicle occupant restraint system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Automotive GmbH Industriestrasse 20 73553 Alfdorf / DE | [2005/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lutz, Jürgen Bussardweg 8 89555 Steinheim / DE | 02 /
Strobel, Ralf Ronsparger Strasse 19 73525 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | Kitzhofer, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04024940.1 | 16.01.2003 | [2005/04] | Priority number, date | DE2002200741U | 18.01.2002 Original published format: DE 20200741 U | [2005/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1500564 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/195, B60R22/26 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
B60R22/26 (EP,US);
B60R22/1951 (EP,US);
B60R22/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/04] | Title | German: | Fahrzeuginsassen-Rückhaltesystem | [2005/04] | English: | Vehicle occupant restraint system | [2005/04] | French: | Système de retenue pour les occupants d'un véhicule | [2005/04] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 12.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.08.2006 | 24.07.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.08.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/27] | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03000654.8 / EP1329367 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2543068 (FOERENADE FABRIKSVERKEN) [Y] 1,2,6-9,13 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]DE2444801 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [A] 1-13 * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [YA]DE4414031 (KEIPER RECARO GMBH CO [DE]) [Y] 1,2,6-9,13 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 26; figures 5,6 * [A] 3-5,10; | [A]DE29806199U (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]DE19960848 (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 66; figure - * |