EP1528276 - Installation structure of electromagnetic multiple-disk clutch device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2006 | Change or deletion - publication of search report | published on 28.07.2006 [2006/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JATCO Ltd 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states JATCO Ltd 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iizuka, Kouichi Jatco Ltd. 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 02 /
Katou, Yoshiaki Jatco Ltd. 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 03 /
Yamazaki, Nobushi Tochigi Fuji Sangyo Kab. Kaisha 2388 Omiya-cho Tochigi-shi, Tochigi 328-8502 / JP | 04 /
Hoshinoya, Takeshi Tochigi Fuji Sangyo Kab. Kaisha 2388 Omiya-cho Tochigi-shi, Tochigi 328-8502 / JP | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04024965.8 | 20.10.2004 | [2005/18] | Priority number, date | JP20030367030 | 28.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003367030 | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1528276 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [2006/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1528276 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Classification | IPC: | F16D27/115 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
F16D27/115 (EP,US);
F16D2027/008 (EP,US);
F16D2300/12 (EP,US);
F16D27/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnungsstruktur einer elektromagnetischen Kupplungsanordnung mit mehrfachen Scheiben | [2005/18] | English: | Installation structure of electromagnetic multiple-disk clutch device | [2005/18] | French: | Structure d'installation d'un ensemble d'embrayage électromagnétique à disques multiples | [2005/18] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 13.07.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2003367030 | JP2003074600 | EP1291540 |