EP1525839 - Dirt container for a surface cleaning apparatus and method of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polar Light Limited 1/F, Dai Wang Street, Tai Po Industrial Estate Tai Po New Territories, Hong Kong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Polar Light Limited 1/F, Dai Wang Street, Tai Po Industrial Estate Tai Po, New Territories, Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conrad, Wayne E. 9 King Street Hampton, Ontario L0B1J0 / CA | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH, Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04025309.8 | 25.10.2004 | [2005/17] | Priority number, date | US20030513226P | 23.10.2003 Original published format: US 513226 P | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1525839 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1525839 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/10, A47L9/14, A47L9/16, A47L5/30, A47L7/02, B04C5/28, A47L9/00, B65D21/02 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
B04C5/28 (EP,US);
A47L5/30 (EP,US);
A47L9/0009 (EP,US);
A47L9/102 (EP,US);
A47L9/1409 (EP,US);
A47L9/1463 (EP,US);
A47L9/1641 (EP,US);
A47L9/165 (EP,US);
A47L9/1683 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/45] | A47L9/10, A47L9/14, A47L9/16, A47L5/30, A47L7/02, B04C5/28 | ||
Former IPC [2005/17] | A47L9/10, A47L9/14, A47L9/16, A47L5/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Title | German: | Schmutzbehälter für ein Bodenreinigungsgerät und Verfahren zur Verwendung desselben | [2005/17] | English: | Dirt container for a surface cleaning apparatus and method of use | [2005/17] | French: | Récipient pour sallisures d'un appareil de nettoyage des surfaces et procédé d'utilisation | [2005/17] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 29.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/42] | 28.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2564339 (NERHEIM LAWRENCE F) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 6-12 * * column 2, lines 12-27; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB720135 (THOMAS HINGLEY SHAW) [Y] 19 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US3440805 (CORDELL MARTIN) [Y] 4,5 * column 2, lines 45-55; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5018240 (HOLMAN ANDREW P [GB]) [Y] 10,15,16 * column 2, lines 61-66 * * column 3, lines 17-19 *; | [Y]DE9114068U (RINGLER, BERNHARD, 7076 WALDSTETTEN, DE) [Y] 19 * page 7, paragraph 3; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5092913 (YEN RICHARD C K [US]) [A] 1 * column 10, line 63 - column 11, line 2; figure 9 *; | [A]US5095579 (BECKER BRIAN E [US]) [A] 19 * figures 4,15 *; | [X]DE4442422 (WAP REINIGUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 5-7; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE20109699U (ZUGEN NI JINKELAI CO [CN]) [Y] 6-9 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1179312 (HOOVER LTD [GB]) [Y] 11,12 * paragraphs [0032] , [0038] *; | [A]US2002043055 (CONRAD WAYNE ERNEST [CA]) [A] * figures 2,3a,3b,4 *; | [A]EP1219222 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [A] 11 * paragraph [0011]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP1252853 (HOOVER LTD [GB]) [A] 13 * paragraph [0024]; figures 1,5-7 *; | [XY]US2003182756 (DUGGAN DANIEL J [US]) [X] 1-3,14,17,18 * paragraphs [0010] , [0029] , [0069] , [0072] , [0078] , [0083] , [0087]; figures 1,4-7 * [Y] 4-12,15,16 |