EP1528665 - Motor control device and motor control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Favess Co. Ltd. 1-18, Miyama Shinpukuji-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYODA KOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | |||
For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | |||
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Favess Co. Ltd. 1-18, Miyama Shinpukuji-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYODA KOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | |||
For all designated states Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-Chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Hiroshi Favess Co., Ltd. 1-18, Miyama Shinpukuji-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/48] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/18] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04025433.6 | 26.10.2004 | [2005/18] | Priority number, date | JP20030368440 | 29.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003368440 | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1528665 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/5395, H02P7/628 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
H02P27/08 (EP,US);
H02M7/487 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/04] |
Former [2005/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Methode und Vorrichtung zur Motorsteuerung | [2005/18] | English: | Motor control device and motor control method | [2005/18] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de contrôle d'un moteur | [2005/18] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 12.01.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5153821 (BLASKO VLADIMIR [US]); | [X]US5610806 (BLASKO VLADIMIR [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]US5706186 (BLASKO VLADIMIR [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0868015 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE]); | [X]WO0070734 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 21, line 7 - page 22, line 26; figure 16 *; | [A]US6529393 (YU ZHENYU [US]) |