EP1653140 - Conveying tube for transporting solid products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esser-Werke KG Zum Puddelhammer 25 59581 Warstein / DE | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Esser, Alexander Eulenweg 1A 59581 Warstein / DE | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Ksoll, Peter, et al Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Ksoll, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Bockermann, Ksoll, Griepenstroh, Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 04025602.6 | 28.10.2004 | [2006/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1653140 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16L23/026, F16L57/00 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
F16L57/06 (EP);
B65G53/523 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Title | German: | Förderrohr für den Feststofftransport | [2006/18] | English: | Conveying tube for transporting solid products | [2006/18] | French: | Tube transporteur de produits solides | [2006/18] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 04.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/24] | 23.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5813437 (ESSER ALEXANDER [DE]) [Y] 2-4 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 37; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19809529 (ESSER WERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 2,7* column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 18; figure 1 *; | [XY]EP1178253 (ESSER WERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 35; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-4; | [A]US6375228 (KLEMM ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * column 4, line 1 - column 7, line 22; figures 1,3 * | by applicant | DE10143187 |