EP1548755 - Round cable for power bus systems with integrated signal conductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wieland Electric GmbH 96045 Bamberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Wieland Electric GmbH 96045 Bamberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bury, Joachim Baumannstrasse 8 92224 Amberg / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Hans-Peter, Dr. Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 23 92224 Amberg / DE | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [2005/26] | Application number, filing date | 04025626.5 | 28.10.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | DE2003161433 | 23.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10361433 | [2005/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1548755 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1548755 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01B9/00 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
H01B9/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/40] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rundleitung für Energiebussysteme mit integrierten Signalleitern | [2005/26] | English: | Round cable for power bus systems with integrated signal conductors | [2005/26] | French: | Câble rond pour des systèmes de bus d'énergie avec des conducteurs de signaux intégrés. | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/21] | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.09.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2180731 (DICKINSON HARRY F) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-19; | [YA]GB2173034 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-19; | [YA]EP0825620 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *[A] 2-19 |