EP1533199 - Airbag module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Automotive Safety Systems GmbH Hefner-Alteneck-Strasse 11 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | [2005/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Michael, Dr. Karlsbader Strasse 14a 63834 Sulzbach / DE | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Kitzhofer, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04025678.6 | 28.10.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | DE2003217961U | 20.11.2003 Original published format: DE 20317961 U | [2005/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533199 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
B60R21/2035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2006/07] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gassackmodul | [2005/21] | English: | Airbag module | [2005/21] | French: | Module à coussin gonflable | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 26.11.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/36] | 17.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.01.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5791682 (HIRAMITSU TETSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-11 * column 5, line 11 - line 22 * * column 5, line 39 - line 64; figures 8,10 * [Y] 2-4,12; | [Y]DE20300171U (TRW AUTOMOTIVE SAFETY SYS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2-4,12* page 1 - page 6; figure - * |