EP1528564 - Data cartridge magazin and method of operation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANDBERG DATA ASA Kjelsasveien 161 0884 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Tandberg Data ASA Kjelsasveien 161 0884 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoelsaeter, Havard Langmyrgrenda 41c 0861 Oslo / NO | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Tönhardt, Marion Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | Tönhardt, Marion, Dr. Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04025816.2 | 29.10.2004 | [2005/18] | Priority number, date | US20030516542P | 31.10.2003 Original published format: US 516542 P | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1528564 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1528564 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/023, G11B15/00, G11B17/00 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
G11B15/684 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/37] |
Former [2005/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bandkassettenmagazin und Verfahren zu dessen Betrieb | [2005/18] | English: | Data cartridge magazin and method of operation thereof | [2005/18] | French: | Magasin de cassettes de données et son procédé de fonctionnement | [2005/18] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 11.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3969007 (LOWRY ALAN B) [Y] 5,7-10 * figures 1,4,5,7 * [A] 6; | [X]EP0240926 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 13; figure 12 *; | [X]EP0519655 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 7; figure 4 *; | [XY]EP0712126 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 12, lines 6-14; figure 1 * [Y] 5,7-10,4,13,14,18,19,21,23; | [A]JPH09183479 (NAKATANI SOGYO KK); | [X]US5781368 (KOTAKI YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * columns 4-5; figure 3 *; | [YA]JPH11273200 (SONY CORP) [Y] 4,13,14,18,19,21,23 * figures 1-11 * [A] 12,20,22; | [X]US6014353 (KONG GYENG-YEOUL [KR], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, lines 21-28 *; | [A]US6019230 (HAYASHI AKIO [JP]) [A] 5-10* abstract *; | [A]DE19849885 (BDT BUERO DATENTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 5-10 * figure 2 *; | [X]WO0041174 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, lines 27-30 *; | [A]US6095445 (HERTRICH GREGORY P [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US6115331 (INOUE KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 4,12-14,18-23 * figure 8 *; | [A]US6396658 (IWABUCHI MASANORI [JP]) [A] 5-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1291860 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 4,12-14,18-23 * paragraph [0089] * |