EP1533830 - Multipole ion guide for mass spectrometry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PerkinElmer Health Sciences, Inc. 940 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451-1457 / US | [2010/33] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states ANALYTICA OF BRANFORD, INC. 29 Business Park Drive Branford, CT 06405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitehouse, Craig M. 220 Pleasant Point Road Branford 06405 Connecticut / US | 02 /
Gulcicek, Erol E. 820 Reservoir Road Cheshire 06410 Connecticut / US | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Faulkner, Thomas John Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/21] | Richardson, Mark Jonathan Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04025968.1 | 27.02.1995 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | US19940202505 | 28.02.1994 Original published format: US 202505 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1533830 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1533830 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/06, H01J49/04, B01D59/44 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
H01J49/0481 (EP,US);
B01D59/44 (US);
H01J49/063 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/23] | B01D59/44, H01J49/00, H01J49/04, H01J49/42, H01J49/16, H01J49/40 | ||
Former IPC [2005/21] | H01J49/04, H01J49/16, H01J49/40 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2005/21] | Title | German: | Multipol-Ionenleiter für Massenspektrometrie | [2005/21] | English: | Multipole ion guide for mass spectrometry | [2005/21] | French: | Guide d'ions mutipolaire pour spectrometrie de masse | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 06.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 28.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95911939.7 / EP0748249 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950911939) is 05.01.1998 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4328420 (FRENCH JOHN B) [A] 1,27,39,40 * column 8, line 58 - column 10, line 14; figure 13 *; | [DA]US4963736 (DOUGLAS DONALD J [CA], et al) [DA] 1,27,39,40 * column 4, line 38 - line 40 *; | [A]US5070240 (LEE MILTON L [US], et al) [A] 1,27,39,40 * column 8, line 26 - line 64; figure 1 *; | [DA] - HONG JIE XU ET AL, "A NEW COOLING AND FOCUSING DEVICE FOR ION GUIDE", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, (19930901), vol. 333, no. 2 / 03, pages 274 - 281, XP000393501 [DA] 1,27,39,40 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-9002(93)91166-K | [DA] - D. M. LUBMAN, "Plasma source atmospheric pressure ionization detection of liquid injection using an ion trap storage/reflectron time-of-flight mass spectrometer", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, COLUMBUS US, (1993), vol. 65, pages 1916 - 1924, XP000394199 [DA] 1,27,39,40 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00062a018 | [DA] - R. D. SMITH, "Capillary zone electrophoresis-mass spectrometry using an electrospray ionization interface", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, COLUMBUS US, (1988), vol. 60, pages 436 - 441, XP002026180 [DA] 1,27,39,40 * page 436, column R, paragraph L; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00156a013 | Examination | US4851669 | US4988869 | US5073713 | - KRUTCHINSKY A N ET AL, "Collisional Damping Interface for an Electrospray Ionization Time-of-Flight Mass Spectrometer", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC, US, (19980601), vol. 9, no. 6, doi:10.1016/S1044-0305(98)00027-0, ISSN 1044-0305, pages 569 - 579, XP004122896 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1044-0305(98)00027-0 |