EP1529562 - Process for the purification of compressed air from the compressed air producing systems of a motor vehicle, and cartridge therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldex Brake Products GmbH Mittelgewannweg 27 69123 Heidelberg / DE | [2005/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seglö, Fredrik Im Heuacker 6/1 69412 Eberbach / DE | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04026054.9 | 03.11.2004 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | DE2003151837 | 06.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10351837 | [2005/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1529562 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/26, B60T17/00 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
B60T17/004 (EP);
B01D53/0415 (EP);
B01D2253/102 (EP);
B01D2253/104 (EP);
B01D2253/106 (EP);
B01D2253/304 (EP);
B01D2257/702 (EP);
B01D2257/80 (EP);
B01D2259/40084 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Reinigen von Druckluft an Druckluftbeschaffungsanlagen von Kraftfahrzeugen sowie Kartusche hierfür | [2005/19] | English: | Process for the purification of compressed air from the compressed air producing systems of a motor vehicle, and cartridge therefore | [2005/19] | French: | Procédé de purification d'air comprimé issu des systèmes de production d'air comprimé d'un véhicule à moteur, et cartouche pour sa mise en oeuvre | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 01.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0490632 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * examples 1,2; claims 1-7 *; | [YD]WO0126783 (HALDEX BRAKE PROD AB [SE], et al) [YD] 1-8 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 9 * * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 32; figure .; claim - *; | [A]US6484413 (LARSSON SVEN-OLOF [SE]) [A] 1-8* column 3, line 9 - line 34; figure - *; | [YP]DE10313575 (WABCO GMBH & CO OHG [DE]) [YP] 1-8 * paragraphs [0011] , [0026]; figure -; claims 1,2 *; | [AP]EP1464375 (HALDEX BRAKE PROD AB [SE]) [AP] 1-8 * paragraphs [0015] - [0024]; figure - * |