EP1655180 - Method for evaluating a rotational movement of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Darvish, Abtin West Strasse 24 42119 Wuppertal / DE | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04026078.8 | 03.11.2004 | [2006/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655180 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1655180 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/01 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
B60R21/0132 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0018 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01327 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Beurteilen einer Rotationsbewegung eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [2006/19] | English: | Method for evaluating a rotational movement of a vehicle | [2006/19] | French: | Procédé d'évaluation du mouvement de rotation d'un véhicule | [2006/19] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 31.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.03.2007 | CZ | 14.03.2007 | DK | 14.03.2007 | EE | 14.03.2007 | FI | 14.03.2007 | GB | 14.03.2007 | IE | 14.03.2007 | NL | 14.03.2007 | PL | 14.03.2007 | RO | 14.03.2007 | SI | 14.03.2007 | SK | 14.03.2007 | TR | 14.03.2007 | BG | 14.06.2007 | SE | 14.06.2007 | GR | 15.06.2007 | ES | 25.06.2007 | IS | 14.07.2007 | PT | 14.08.2007 | HU | 15.09.2007 | AT | 03.11.2007 | LU | 03.11.2007 | BE | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
BG | 14.06.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
AT | 03.11.2007 | ||
LU | 03.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
AT | 03.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/15] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
AT | 03.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
IS | 14.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6363306 (PALMERTZ CAMILLA [SE], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 2 - column 8, line 52; figure - *[A] 2-13; | [X]US2002173882 (TOBARU SHIGEO [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0110]; figures 13,14 *; | [XA]EP1388474 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0019]; figure - * [A] 2-13 |