EP1531023 - Drilling insert which is clamped in a body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heule, Ulf Jacob-Schmid-Heiny-Strasse 12 9436 Balgach / CH | [2005/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heule, Heinrich Kristallstrasse 6 9434 Au / CH | 02 /
Studer, Harry Strimäderstrasse 8 9436 Balgach / CH | [2005/20] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 04026294.1 | 05.11.2004 | [2005/20] | Priority number, date | DE20031053514 | 14.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10353514 | [2005/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1531023 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1531023 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1531023 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/02 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
B23B51/00 (EP,US);
B23B2251/18 (EP,US);
B23B2251/50 (EP,US);
Y10S408/713 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1936 (EP,US);
Y10T407/25 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/20] | Title | German: | Bohrplatte welche klemmend in einem Grundkörper befestigt ist. | [2005/25] | English: | Drilling insert which is clamped in a body | [2005/20] | French: | Plaquette de forage qui est tenu serré dans un corps de base | [2005/25] |
Former [2005/20] | Bohrplatte welche klemmend in einem Grundkörper befestigt ist | ||
Former [2005/20] | Plaquette de forage qui est tenue serrée dans un corps de base | Examination procedure | 31.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05015111.7 / EP1621275 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE Kennametal Inc. PO Box 231 Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US Opponent's representative Dörr, Matthias, et al, et al Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE Kennametal Inc. PO Box 231 Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US Opponent's representative Dörr, Matthias, et al, et al Tergau & Pohl, Patentanwälte, Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | 07.08.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.11.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.04.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/27] | Appeal following opposition | 18.07.2009 | Appeal received No. T1523/09 | 17.09.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.04.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 13.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.04.2010 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 03.10.2007 | CY | 03.10.2007 | DK | 03.10.2007 | EE | 03.10.2007 | FI | 03.10.2007 | IE | 03.10.2007 | LI | 03.10.2007 | NL | 03.10.2007 | PL | 03.10.2007 | RO | 03.10.2007 | SI | 03.10.2007 | SK | 03.10.2007 | TR | 03.10.2007 | LU | 05.11.2007 | BE | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | BG | 03.01.2008 | GR | 04.01.2008 | IS | 03.02.2008 | PT | 03.03.2008 | HU | 04.04.2008 | [2010/46] |
Former [2009/44] | CY | 03.10.2007 | |
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
EE | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SI | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
TR | 03.10.2007 | ||
LU | 05.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
IS | 03.02.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
HU | 04.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 03.10.2007 | |
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
EE | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SI | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
LU | 05.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
IS | 03.02.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 03.10.2007 | |
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
EE | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SI | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
IS | 03.02.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
EE | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SI | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
IS | 03.02.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
EE | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
IS | 03.02.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
IE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
IS | 03.02.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
IS | 03.02.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
IS | 03.02.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
IS | 03.02.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | NL | 03.10.2007 | |
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
IS | 03.02.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | NL | 03.10.2007 | |
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
IS | 03.02.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4337677 (RAUCKHORST JAMES E, et al) [Y] 11 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 2; figures 4-8 *; | [X]US4744704 (GALVEFORS NILS L [SE]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 33; figures 4-8 *; | [XY]US4854789 (EVSEANKO JR NICHOLAS [US]) [X] 1-3,6,9 * column 6, line 6 - column 7, line 12; figures 6-9 * [Y] 11; | [A]US6514019 (SCHULZ ARMIN [DE]) [A] 8* column 11, line 17 - line 55; figure 8 * |