EP1655046 - Safe syringe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wu, Wei-Shui No. 97, Kuo-Chung Rd. Ta-Li Taichung Hsien / TW | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/19] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04026304.8 | 05.11.2004 | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655046 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
A61M5/322 (EP);
A61M15/0011 (EP);
A61M2005/3235 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/03] |
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitsspritze | [2006/19] | English: | Safe syringe | [2006/19] | French: | Seringue de sécurité | [2006/19] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/38] | 03.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.01.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0360313 (HAAK ABRAHAM VAN DEN [NL]) [X] 1 * column 8, line 13 - line 50; figures 5A,5B *; | [X]EP0596211 (JAPAN CHEM RES [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5658257 (RYLES LOUIS [AU]) [A] 4-6 * column 5, line 35 - line 67; figure 9 *; | [X]EP1356838 (HSU CHI-HSUAN [TW]) [X] 1* paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020]; figures 4,5 *; | [X]WO2004045683 (DUGMORE PETER BALFOUR [ZA], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [E]US2005020987 (HUANG PING-TE [TW]) [E] 1 * abstract * |