EP1502607 - Method and apparatus for testing the suitability of multi-component liquids for evaporating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC. 1525 Howe Street Racine Wisconsin 53403 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC. 1525 Howe Street Racine, Wisconsin 53403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schramm, Heather R. W5405 Greening Road Whitewater WI 53190 / US | 02 /
Martens, Edward, J. III 6221 Berkshire Lane Racine WI 53402 / US | 03 /
Clausen, Susan M. 1606 Wilson Court Zion IL 60099 / US | 04 /
Varanasi, Padma, P. 2 Cherrywood Court Racine WI 53402 / US | 05 /
Crandall, Jesse Ben 10860 North Loop Road Drummond WI 54832 / US | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04026309.7 | 04.02.2003 | [2005/05] | Priority number, date | US20020066814 | 04.02.2002 Original published format: US 66814 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1502607 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1502607 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/14, B01D1/16, A61L9/00, G01N25/02, G01N13/02, G01N5/04 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
A01M1/205 (EP,KR,US);
A61L9/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61L9/145 (EP,US);
A61L9/16 (EP,US);
B05B17/0646 (EP,KR,US);
B05B17/0684 (EP,KR,US);
G01N13/02 (EP,US);
A61L2209/135 (KR);
G01N2013/0241 (EP,US);
G01N25/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung um die Verdampfungsfähigkeit mehrkomponentiger Flüssigkeiten zu testen | [2005/05] | English: | Method and apparatus for testing the suitability of multi-component liquids for evaporating | [2005/05] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour tester l'aptitude d'un liquide à plusieurs composants pour l'évaporation | [2005/05] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 25.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03707697.3 / EP1471950 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030707697) is 29.11.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3441317 (KOPECKY PETER PROF DR [DE], et al) [X] 7* abstract *; | [X]WO0058709 (BRITISH NUCLEAR FUELS PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * |