EP1532892 - Automatic retraction device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FULTERER Gesellschaft mbH Höchster Strasse 16 6890 Lustenau / AT | [2012/16] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Fulterer Gesellschaft m.b.H. Höchster Strasse 16 6890 Lustenau / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonat, Günter Bahnhofstrasse 12 6911 Lochau / AT | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Ralf U., et al Hofmann & Fechner Patentanwälte Hörnlingerstrasse 3 Postfach 5 6830 Rankweil / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Hofmann, Ralf U., et al Hefel & Hofmann Patentanwälte Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 6806 Feldkirch / AT | ||
Former [2005/21] | Hefel, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 6800 Feldkirch / AT | Application number, filing date | 04026629.8 | 10.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | AT20030001873 | 21.11.2003 Original published format: AT 18732003 | [2005/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1532892 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/04 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
A47B88/467 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Title | German: | Selbsteinzugvorrichtung | [2005/21] | English: | Automatic retraction device | [2005/21] | French: | Dispositif de retrait automatique | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 11.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0552500 (SCHOCK METALLWERK [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5364179 (BRUESTLE KLAUS [AT], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0631745 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [DA] 1* figures 4,5 * | by applicant | DE4020277 | AT393948B | DE4329374 | EP0631745 | AT401334B | AT401716B | AT4912U | AT5527U |