EP1657928 - Mobile television receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | 05.01.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Goering-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teichner, Detlef Ortinstrasse 51 78126 Königsfeld / DE | 02 /
Link, Hermann Forlenweg 23 78166 Donaueschingen / DE | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04026829.4 | 11.11.2004 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1657928 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N7/173, H04L12/64 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
H04N21/41422 (EP,US);
H04N21/414 (KR);
H04N21/431 (KR);
H04N21/442 (KR);
H04N17/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/20] | Title | German: | Mobiler Fernsehempfänger | [2006/20] | English: | Mobile television receiver | [2006/20] | French: | Récepteur mobile de télévision | [2006/20] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 12.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2017 | 14.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/06] | 29.09.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1246417 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,11-29,35-46 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 2,4,8 *; | [A]US2003003899 (TASHIRO SHIGERU [JP], et al) [A] 1-46* abstract *; | [E]EP1505836 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-7,11-29,35-46 * abstract * * paragraph [0046] * | by applicant | EP1246417 |