EP1541540 - Process for the preparation of pure magnesium alkoxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/24] | Process for the preparation of pure alkaline earth alkoxides | ||
[2007/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rauleder, Hartwig, Dr. Uhlandweg 51a 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | 02 /
Standke, Burkhard, Dr. Chrischonastrasse 25 79540 Lörrach / DE | [2005/24] | Application number, filing date | 04027034.0 | 13.11.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | DE20031058412 | 13.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10358412 | [2005/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1541540 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1541540 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/70, C07C31/30 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C07C29/705 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/705, C07C31/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung alkoxidreiner Magnesiumalkoxide | [2007/47] | English: | Process for the preparation of pure magnesium alkoxides | [2007/47] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d' alcoolates de magnesium purs | [2007/47] |
Former [2005/24] | Verfahren zur Herstellung alkoxyreiner Erdalkalialkoxide | ||
Former [2005/24] | Process for the preparation of pure alkaline earth alkoxides | ||
Former [2005/24] | Procédé pour la préparation d' alcoolates alcalino-terreux purs | Examination procedure | 13.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 10.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.04.2008 | DK | 02.04.2008 | EE | 02.04.2008 | IE | 02.04.2008 | RO | 02.04.2008 | SI | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | BG | 02.07.2008 | GR | 03.07.2008 | IS | 02.08.2008 | PT | 03.09.2008 | HU | 03.10.2008 | LU | 13.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
TR | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
HU | 03.10.2008 | ||
LU | 13.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
HU | 03.10.2008 | ||
LU | 13.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LU | 13.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | DK | 02.04.2008 | |
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 02.04.2008 | |
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/17] | DK | 02.04.2008 | |
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 02.04.2008 | |
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | SI | 02.04.2008 | |
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | SI | 02.04.2008 | |
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 02.04.2008 | |
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 02.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB667708 (STANDARD OIL DEV CO) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]GB767601 (HARDMAN & HOLDEN LTD, et al) [X] 1-3* the whole document *; | [X]EP0026547 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 5 - page 8; claim - * |