EP1629766 - Blood sugar level measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Ok-Kyung, Hitachi, Ltd., Intel. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Kim, Yoon-Ok, Hitachi, Ltd., Intel. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Ouchi, Katsumi, Hitachi, Ltd., Intel. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Mitsumaki, Hiroshi, Hitachi Ltd Intel. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2006/09] | Application number, filing date | 04027098.5 | 15.11.2004 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | JP20040245646 | 25.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004245646 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1629766 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/45] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Messung des Blutzuckerspiegels | [2006/09] | English: | Blood sugar level measuring apparatus | [2006/09] | French: | Appareil de mesure du taux de sucre sanguin | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/51] | 02.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000074829 ; | JP2000074829 [ ] (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [A]WO0128414 (KAUFMANN KIM YUN OAK [DE], et al) [A] 8,9 * page 8, lines 10-17 * * page 9, lines 17-24 *; | [A]US6377828 (CHAIKEN JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 6, lines 8-46 *; | [Y] - OK KYUNG CHO ET AL, "NONINVASIVE MEASUREMENT OF GLUCOSE BY METABOLIC HEAT CONFORMATION METHOD", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 50, no. 10, ISSN 0009-9147, (20040812), URL: http://www.clinchem.org/cgi/reprint/clinchem.2004.036954v1.pdf, (20051201), XP002357173 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * * figures 1,2,4,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2003.29769 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000074829 A 20000314 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * |