EP1533170 - Assisting system for an accelerator pedal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | ||
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamura, Tomohiro D-808, 5 Noukendaihigashi Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kondoh, Takayuki 3-4-4-102, Shimosueyoshi Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Hoefer, Theodor Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04027329.4 | 17.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | JP20030391123 | 20.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003391123 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533170 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1533170 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60K26/02 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
B60W50/16 (EP,US);
B60W40/02 (EP,US);
B60W40/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/07] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hilfsystem für ein Gaspedal | [2005/21] | English: | Assisting system for an accelerator pedal | [2005/21] | French: | Système d'assistance pour une pédale d'accélérateur | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 17.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.02.2008 | 06.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH05231194 ; | [A]DE4216764 (NOACK FRITZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-21* column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 64 *; | [Y]US5521580 (KANEKO KAZUMA [JP], et al) [Y] 4,6,11,13,17,20 * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 11; figure 6 *; | [X]US2002143449 (YASUDA AKIO [JP]) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] *; | [AD]US2003060936 (YAMAMURA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-21 * paragraphs [0148] - [0164] * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931215), vol. 017, no. 686, Database accession no. (M - 1529), & JP05231194 A 19930907 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,12,14-16,18,19,21 * abstract * [Y] 4,6,11,13,17,20 |