EP1555074 - Twin-roll casting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KME Germany AG Postfach 3320 49023 Osnabrück / DE | [2007/28] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states KM Europa Metal Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3320 D-49023 Osnabrück / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wobker, Hans-Günter Semmelweisstrasse 9 49565 Bramsche / DE | 02 /
Kolbeck, Dietmar Katharinenstrasse 12 49439 Steinfeld / DE | 03 /
Maiwald, Klaus Rua Astronauta Neil Armstrong 120, Apt. 1001, Ed. 52060-170 Parnamirim/Recife-PE / BR | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Pietrzykowski, Anja Klosterstrasse 29 49074 Osnabrück / DE | [2005/29] | Application number, filing date | 04027353.4 | 18.11.2004 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | DE20041002124 | 14.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004002124 | [2005/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1555074 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1555074 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
B22D11/0622 (EP,US);
B22D11/06 (KR);
B22D11/0651 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Title | German: | Giesswalzanlage | [2005/29] | English: | Twin-roll casting machine | [2005/29] | French: | Installation de coulée continue entre cylindres | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 13.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.01.2008 | CZ | 09.01.2008 | EE | 09.01.2008 | IE | 09.01.2008 | PL | 09.01.2008 | RO | 09.01.2008 | SI | 09.01.2008 | SK | 09.01.2008 | TR | 09.01.2008 | BG | 09.04.2008 | IS | 09.05.2008 | HU | 10.07.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 09.01.2008 | |
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
HU | 10.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 09.01.2008 | |
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 09.01.2008 | |
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 09.01.2008 | |
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | IE | 09.01.2008 | |
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | IE | 09.01.2008 | |
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | PL | 09.01.2008 | |
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | SI | 09.01.2008 | |
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | SI | 09.01.2008 | |
IS | 09.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 09.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01166862 ; | [A]JPS5961551 ; | [A]JPH01170553 ; | [A]EP1163965 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 6* abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890927), vol. 013, no. 432, Database accession no. (M - 874), & JP01166862 A 19890630 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [A] 7,8,10,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840802), vol. 008, no. 166, Database accession no. (M - 314), & JP59061551 A 19840407 (HITACHI KINZOKU KK) [A] 12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891004), vol. 013, no. 441, Database accession no. (M - 876), & JP01170553 A 19890705 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |