EP1534053 - Thick film conductor paste compositions for LTCC tape [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 4417 Lancaster Pike Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | ||
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company Legal Patent Records Center, 4417 Lancaster Pike Wilmington, DE 19895 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Yueli 229 Sarazen Meadow Way Morrisville 27560 North Carolina / US | 02 /
Ollivier, Patricia J. 8500 Pillar Gate Lane Raleigh 27613 North Carolina / US | 03 /
Needes, Christopher R. 117 Galway Drive Chapel Hill 27517 North Carolina / US | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Hoffmann, Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/21] | Thomson, James B. Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04027456.5 | 18.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | US20030523371P | 19.11.2003 Original published format: US 523371 P | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1534053 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1534053 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/09, H01B1/16 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
H01B1/16 (EP,US);
H01B1/22 (KR);
C09D5/24 (KR);
H01L23/49883 (EP,US);
H05K1/092 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/44] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Leitfähige Dickfilmpastenzusammensetzungen für LTCC-Band | [2005/21] | English: | Thick film conductor paste compositions for LTCC tape | [2005/21] | French: | Compositions de pâtes conductrices à couche épaisse pour bande LTCC | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 21.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 02.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4098949 (KOSIOREK RAYMOND STANLEY) [A] 1-4 * claim - *; | [A]US4187201 (HILSON DAVID G [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * examples 1,6 *; | [DA]US4416932 (NAIR KUMARAN M [US]) [DA] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]US4906404 (SUEHIRO MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 6, lines 7-20 *; | [Y]US5126915 (PEPIN JOHN G [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,9,10 * claim - *; | [A]US5296413 (CARROLL ALAN F [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 46 *; | [A]JPH0737420 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US5456778 (FUKUTA JUNZO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6,9,10 * claim - *; | [Y]US5643841 (YAMAKI SACHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6,9,10 * claim - * |