EP1534051 - Method of making innerlayer panels and printed wiring boards using X-ray identification of fiducials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | For all designated states Coretec Inc. 8150 Sheppard Avenue East Toronto, ON M1B 5KS / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
For all designated states Coretec Inc. 8150 Sheppard Avenue East Toronto, ON M1B 5KS / CA | |||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
For all designated states Coretec Inc. 8150 Sheppard Avenue East Toronto, ON M1B 5KS / CA | |||
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
For all designated states Coretec Inc. 8150 Sheppard Avenue East Toronto, ON M1B 5KS / CA | |||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states E.I.Du pont de nemours and company 4417 Lancaster Pike Wilmington., DE 19805 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borland, William J. 106 Turquoise Creek Drive Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US | 02 /
Ferguson, Saul 1733 Euclid Road Durham, North Carolina 27713 / US | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/22] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/21] | Thomson, James B. Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04027548.9 | 19.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | US20030718044 | 20.11.2003 Original published format: US 718044 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1534051 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1534051 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/02, H05K1/16, H05K3/46 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
H05K3/4679 (EP,US);
H05K1/16 (KR);
H05K1/0269 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H05K1/092 (EP,US);
H05K1/162 (EP,US);
H05K1/167 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0355 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09063 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09763 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09918 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0338 (EP,US);
H05K2203/167 (EP,US);
H05K3/0082 (EP,US);
H05K3/064 (EP,US);
H05K3/4652 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49128 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4913 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49131 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49146 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49156 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/07] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Innenschicht-Platten und von gedruckten Leiterplatten unter Verwendung von Identifizierung von Justiermarken mittels Röntgenstrahlung | [2005/21] | English: | Method of making innerlayer panels and printed wiring boards using X-ray identification of fiducials | [2005/21] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de panneaux à couches internes et de panneaux à circuit imprimé en utlisation d'identification de repères d'alignement par rayons X | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001135941 ; | [A]JP2001022099 ; | [A]JPH1051143 ; | [A]JPH11330316 ; | [A]US6237218 (OGAWA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,7,8,11-13,17 * column 9, line 18 - line 52 * * column 10, line 35 - line 38 * * figures 11-18,21-23; examples 6-9,13 *; | [A]EP1265466 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,6-9,11-13,15-17 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1307079 (ADTEC ENG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US6631551 (BOWLES PHILIP HARBAUGH [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,8,9,11-13,15-17 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001135941 A 20010518 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010508), vol. 2000, no. 16, & JP2001022099 A 20010126 (ADTEC ENGINEENG CO LTD) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10051143 A 19980220 (OKI PURINTETSUDO CIRCUIT KK) [A] 1,8,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11330316 A 19991130 (NEC TOHOKU LTD) [A] 1,13 * abstract * |