EP1536576 - Method of measuring reception timing of a frequency correction burst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seong, Shee-Hoon c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/02] |
Former [2005/22] | 01 /
Seong, Shee-Hoon c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/11] | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2005/22] | Lang, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04027835.0 | 24.11.2004 | [2005/22] | Priority number, date | KR20030083549 | 24.11.2003 Original published format: KR 2003083549 | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1536576 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1536576 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
H04W56/0035 (EP);
H04W56/00 (KR);
H04B7/2662 (EP);
H04W52/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/08] |
Former [2005/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zu Messen der Empfangszeit eines Frequenzkorrekturbursts | [2005/22] | English: | Method of measuring reception timing of a frequency correction burst | [2005/22] | French: | Procédé de mesure de l'instant de réception de salves de correction de fréquence | [2005/22] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0717538 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 3-8 * column 13, line 7 - line 19 *; | [A]GB2315198 (NEC TECHNOLOGIES [GB]) [A] 3-8* page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 6 *; | [X]US5970102 (HWANG SEONG-KYU [KR]) [X] 1-8 * column 5, line 27 - column 7, line 43; figures 2,3D *; | [X]EP1045534 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0543488 |