EP1538016 - Drive power transmission control method and system for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states Toyoda Koki Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Tsuyoshi, Jtekt Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | 02 /
Ohno, Akihiro, Jtekt Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [2006/49] |
Former [2005/23] | 01 /
Murakami, Tsuyoshi, Toyoda Koki K.K. 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Ohno, Akihiro, Toyoda Koki K.K. 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/23] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04027857.4 | 24.11.2004 | [2005/23] | Priority number, date | JP20030403963 | 03.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003403963 | [2005/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1538016 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1538016 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1538016 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60K23/08 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
B60K23/0808 (EP,US);
B60W30/18027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/36] |
Former [2005/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftübertragungssteuerungsverfahren und -system für ein Fahrzeug | [2005/23] | English: | Drive power transmission control method and system for vehicle | [2005/23] | French: | Procédure et méthode de commande de transmission de puissance pour véhicule | [2005/23] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 15.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH07186766 ; | [A]US6132332 (YASUI MAKOTO [JP]) [A] 1,6* column 5, line 28 - line 50; figure 1 *; | [A]US6606549 (MURAKAMI TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * figures 2,9 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07186766 A 19950725 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [DA] 1,6 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH07186766 |