EP1518514 - Anal incontinence treatment apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Implantica Patents Ltd JCR Offices, office 1 Triq in-Negozju Qasam Industrijali Mriehel, Birkirkara BKR 3000 / MT | [2017/30] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states Abdomica AG Zugerstrasse 74 6340 Baar / CH | ||
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Potencia Medical AG Zugerstrasse 74 6341 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forsell, Peter Aegeristrasse 66 6300 Zug / CH | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | Strandin, Heléne Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 04027947.3 | 07.02.2001 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | US20000503148 | 11.02.2000 Original published format: US 503148 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1518514 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1518514 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/378, A61F2/00 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
A61F2/0036 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0001 (EP,US);
A61N1/3787 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/13] | A61F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/13] | Title | German: | Behandlungsvorrichtung zur analen Inkontinenz | [2005/13] | English: | Anal incontinence treatment apparatus | [2005/13] | French: | Appareil de traitement de l'incontinence anale | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 23.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 07.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01906445.0 / EP1253888 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010906445) is 06.04.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 20 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2013 | 28.02.2014 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4118805 (REIMELS HARRY G) [A] 1 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 32 * * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 28 ** figures 5a-5c *; | [A]WO9601597 (DACOMED CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 15 * * figures 1-5b *; | [X]US5509888 (MILLER PAUL L [US]) [X] 1-109 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 2 * * column 5, line 45 - line 48 * * column 7, line 11 - line 14 * * column 10, line 64 - column 11, line 10 * * figures 1-3.8 *; | [X]US5593443 (CARTER KENNETH B [GB], et al) [X] 1-109 * column 4, line 50 - line 59 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 5 * * figures 1-7 * | Examination | WO0158388 | by applicant | US3939823 | US4407296 | US4571749 | US4738267 | US4846181 | US5540731 |