EP1548898 - Multiple pole connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hirose Electric Co., Ltd. 5-23 Oosaki 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states HIROSE ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-23 Oosaki 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states HIROSE ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-23 Oosaki 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zemba, Hirotaka c/o Hirose Electric Co., Ltd. 5-23 Oosaki 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/06] |
Former [2005/26] | 01 /
Zemba, Hirotaka Hirose Electric Co., Ltd. 5-23 Oosaki 5-chome Shinagaw-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Pätzold, Herbert Pasinger Strasse 6 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Pätzold, Herbert, Dr.-Ing. Steubstrasse 10 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 04028063.8 | 25.11.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | JP20030398705 | 28.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003398705 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1548898 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1548898 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/658, H01R9/03 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
H01R13/65912 (EP,US);
H01R13/648 (KR);
H01R13/52 (EP,US);
H01R13/6584 (EP,US);
H01R13/746 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2006/12] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrpoliger Verbinder | [2005/26] | English: | Multiple pole connector | [2005/26] | French: | Connecteur multipolaire | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.04.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.02.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4243290 (WILLIAMS ROBERT A) [A] 1,4-6* figures 1-12 *; | [Y]US4579415 (VAN BRUNT MICHAEL K [US], et al) [Y] 2,5,6 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 15 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4790765 (EHRENFELS ALFRED L [US], et al) [A] 1,4-6 * figures 1,2,4,6-8 *; | [X]DE4307728 (CONTACT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 31 *; | [A]DE19841572 (KRONE AG [DE]) [A] 1,4-6 * column 2, line 1 - line 38 * * figures 1-7 *; | [XY]US2002002005 (WHYBROW DAVID ERNEST [GB]) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,5,6 |