EP1538483 - Measuring method and apparatus, exposure method and apparatus and device manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/40] |
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasegawa, Takayuki Canon K.K. 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/23] | Böckelen, Rainer Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04028147.9 | 26.11.2004 | [2005/23] | Priority number, date | JP20030399487 | 28.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003399487 | [2005/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1538483 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1538483 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
G03F7/706 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2006/09] |
Former [2005/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Messmethode und Messapparatur, Belichtungsmethode und Apparatur und Herstellungsmethode von Halbleiterbauelementen | [2005/23] | English: | Measuring method and apparatus, exposure method and apparatus and device manufacturing method | [2005/23] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la mesure, méthode et appareil d'exposition et méthode de fabrication d'un dispositif | [2005/23] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5835217 (MEDECKI HECTOR [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5976737 (OKA NOBUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US6573997 (GOLDBERG KENNETH ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO03102529 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP], et al) [PA] 1* abstract *; | [X] - GOLDBERG KENNETH A ET AL, "Extreme ultraviolet alignment and testing of a four-mirror ring field extreme ultraviolet optical system", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY B: MICROELECTRONICS PROCESSING AND PHENOMENA, AMERICAN VACUUM SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200011), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 2911 - 2915, XP012008489 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.1319703 | [X] - GOLBERG K A ET AL, "EUV interferometry of a four-mirror ring field", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, (2000), vol. 3997, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 867 - 873, XP002313122 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.390045 | [X] - NAULLEAU P P ET AL, "Static microfield printing at the Advanced Light Source with the ETS Set-2 optic", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, (2002), vol. 4688, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 64 - 71, XP002313123 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.472318 | [X] - NAULLEAU P ET AL, "Adding static printing capabilities to the EUV phase-shifting point diffraction interferometer", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, (2001), vol. 4343, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 639 - 645, XP002313124 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.436633 | [A] - MEDECKI H ET AL, "PHASE-SHIFTING POINT DIFFRACTION INTERFEROMETER", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, US, (199610), vol. 21, no. 19, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 1526 - 1528, XP000885322 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | - GOLDBERG KENNETH A. ET AL., "Extreme ultraviolet alignment and testing of a four-mirror ring field extreme ultraviolet optical system", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SIENCE & TECHNOLOGY B, (2000), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 2911 - 2915 | - GOLDBERG KENNETH A. ET AL., "EUV interferometry of a four-mirror ring field", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (2000), vol. 3997, pages 867 - 873 | - NAULLEAU PATRICK P. ET AL., "Static microfield printing at the Advanced Light Source with the ETS Set-2 optic", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (2002), vol. 4688, pages 64 - 71 | - NAULLEAU PATRICK P. ET AL., "dding static printing capabilities to the EUV phase-shifting point diffraction interferometer", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (2001), vol. 4343, pages 639 - 645 |