EP1550976 - Information processing apparatus, information processing method, program for implementing information processing method, information processing system, and method for information processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Noriyuki Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa, 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Melzer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04028600.7 | 02.12.2004 | [2005/27] | Priority number, date | JP20030403146 | 02.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003403146 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1550976 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1550976 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
G06F16/40 (EP,US);
G06F16/45 (US);
G06F16/48 (US);
Y10S707/99937 (US)
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | G06K9/62, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/36] |
Former [2005/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Informationsbearbeitungsgerät, Informationsbearbeitungsverfahren, Programm zum Durchführen eines Informationsbearbeitungsverfahrens, Informationsbearbeitungssystem, und Verfahren für ein Informationsbearbeitungssystem | [2005/27] | English: | Information processing apparatus, information processing method, program for implementing information processing method, information processing system, and method for information processing system | [2005/27] | French: | Dipositif de traitement d'informations, procédé de traitement d'informations, programme pour mise en oeuvre du procédé de traitement d'informations, système de traitement d'informations, et procédé pour sytème de traitement d'informations | [2005/27] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 18.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/51] | 31.07.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP08100595.1 / EP1909203 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1026601 (HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS IND [KR]) [X] 1-33 * abstract ** paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0059] *; | [X]WO0160064 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-33 * abstract * * page 12, line 13 - page 19, line 13 * * figures 8,9 *; | [X]WO02071265 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-33 * abstract * * page 3, line 13 - page 6, line L * * figure 2 *; | [X]US2003217047 (MARCHISIO GIOVANNI B [US]) [X] 1-33 * figures 1,2 * * figure 4 * * figure 7 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0106] * | by applicant | EP1026601 | WO0160064 | WO02071265 | US2003217047 |