EP1544709 - Distribution computer system managing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Katsuyoshi 14-19, Ayumigaoka Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-0016 / JP | 02 /
Kajimoto, Yasuhiko 32-17, Sumiyoshidai Sasayama-shi Hyogo 669-2231 / JP | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04028763.3 | 03.12.2004 | [2005/25] | Priority number, date | JP20030405608 | 04.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003405608 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1544709 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, H04L9/00, G06F9/50 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
G06F21/604 (EP,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/105 (EP,US);
G06F21/121 (EP,US);
G06F21/6218 (EP,US);
G06F9/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/11] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verwaltung eines verteilten Computersystems | [2005/25] | English: | Distribution computer system managing method | [2005/25] | French: | Procédé de gestion d'un système d'ordinateurs distribué | [2005/25] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 07.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6105069 (FRANKLIN NICHOLAS HUSTON [US], et al) [A] 1* column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 28 *; | [X]US2003115292 (GRIFFIN PHILIP B [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 1, paragraphs 5,11,12 *; | [DX] - Sun ONE Grid Engine 5.3 Administration and User's Guide, SANTA CLARA, CA, USA, SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC., (200210), XP002325905 [DX] 1 * page 1 - page 12 * * page 163 - page 176 * * page 183 - page 235 * | [X] - LORCH M ET AL, "The PRIMA system for privilege management, authorization and enforcement in grid environments", GRID COMPUTING, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. FOURTH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON NOV. 17, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (2003), ISBN 0-7695-2026-X, pages 109 - 116, XP010680017 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GRID.2003.1261705 | [A] - SANDHU R S ET AL, "ACCESS CONTROL: PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER. PISCATAWAY, N.J, US, (19940901), vol. 32, no. 9, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 40 - 48, XP000476554 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.312842 |