EP1555381 - Lamelae for the shading or light guiding in buildings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÜCO International KG Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15 33609 Bielefeld / DE | [2008/37] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states SCHÜCO International KG Karolinenstrasse 1-15 33609 Bielefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blümel, Volker Heeperstrasse 420 33719 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
Wecke, Oliver Budeskampweg 3 31855 Aerzen / DE | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 04028892.0 | 07.12.2004 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | DE20042000549U | 15.01.2004 Original published format: DE 202004000549 U | [2005/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1555381 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1555381 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1555381 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/084 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
E06B7/084 (EP);
E06B9/386 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Title | German: | Lamelle zur Beschattung oder Lichtlenkung an Gebäuden | [2005/29] | English: | Lamelae for the shading or light guiding in buildings | [2005/29] | French: | Lamelle pour diminuer ou diriger la lumière dans les bâtiments | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.04.2011 | CZ | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | EE | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | HU | 13.04.2011 | IE | 13.04.2011 | LT | 13.04.2011 | PL | 13.04.2011 | RO | 13.04.2011 | SE | 13.04.2011 | SI | 13.04.2011 | SK | 13.04.2011 | BG | 13.07.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | IS | 13.08.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | LU | 07.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
LU | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
LU | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
PT | 16.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1530512 (FERMETURES F M B) [X] 1-3,6,7 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 8 - page 2, column 1, paragraph 3; figure 2 * [Y] 9; | [A]WO9005602 (TOENDER HYDRO ALUMINIUM [DK]); | [Y]US5052150 (CHEN CHIH-TSUNG [TW]) [Y] 9 * figure 1 *; | [XA]FR2744166 (ALCAN FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1-3,6 * page 5, line 34 - page 7, line 37; figures 2,4 * [A] 8 | by applicant | FR1530512 | US5052150 | FR2744166 | DE20100756U |