EP1541537 - Dielectric ceramic powder, method for producing the same, and composite dielectric material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2009/01] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanada, Isao TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Norimasa TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 03 /
Ozawa, Mio TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 04 /
Che, Shenglei TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04029105.6 | 08.12.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | JP20030412387 | 10.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003412387 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1541537 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1541537 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/465, H01B3/12, C08K3/22 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C01G23/006 (EP,US);
C04B35/46 (KR);
C04B35/465 (EP,US);
C04B35/47 (EP,US);
C04B35/6261 (EP,US);
C04B35/6262 (EP,US);
H01B3/12 (KR);
H05K1/0373 (EP,US);
C01P2002/34 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3213 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3215 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3236 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3239 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3262 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3454 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5409 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Title | German: | Dielektrisches keramisches Pulver, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung sowie diekektrisches Verbundmaterial | [2005/24] | English: | Dielectric ceramic powder, method for producing the same, and composite dielectric material | [2005/24] | French: | Poudre diélectrique céramique, son procédé de fabrication et matériau diélectrique composite | [2005/24] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | CY | 31.12.2008 | CZ | 31.12.2008 | DK | 31.12.2008 | EE | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | IT | 31.12.2008 | LT | 31.12.2008 | NL | 31.12.2008 | PL | 31.12.2008 | RO | 31.12.2008 | SI | 31.12.2008 | SK | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | BG | 31.03.2009 | SE | 31.03.2009 | GR | 01.04.2009 | ES | 11.04.2009 | IS | 30.04.2009 | PT | 01.06.2009 | HU | 01.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
HU | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS61158821 ; | [XA]JPH08231274 ; | [XA]US3367766 (JONATHAN BARRINGTON, et al) [X] 1-7,14,15 * example 26; table XVI * * examples 28-32; table XIX * * claims 1-4 * * figure 9 * [A] 8-13,16; | [XA]GB1123806 (DU PONT) [X] 1-7,14,15 * examples 1,29; table XIX * * page 19, line 30 - line 39 * * example 17; table XI * * example 26; table XVI * * page 28, line 20 - line 25 * * claims 1-14,28-32 * * figure 9 * [A] 8-13,16; | [XA]US4468432 (MATSUKURA KAZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,14,15 * examples 5-8 * * claims 1,7-10 * [A] 8-13,16; | [DX]WO03010092 (TDK CORP [JP], et al) [DX] 1-7,14-16 * abstract ** example 3 *; | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 35, Database accession no. 1986-228907, XP002313913 & JPS61158821 A 19860718 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * figure 5 * [A] 8-13,16 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08231274 A 19960910 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1-7,14-16 * abstract * [A] 8-13,16 |