EP1553297 - Check valve and pump including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2007/35] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onishi, Hitoshi Alps Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7, Yukigaya-Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04029485.2 | 13.12.2004 | [2005/28] | Priority number, date | JP20030416949 | 15.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003416949 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1553297 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1553297 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553297 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F04B53/10, F16K15/14, F04B43/04 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
F04B53/1065 (EP,US);
F04B43/046 (EP,US);
F16K15/148 (EP,US);
Y10T137/789 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/46] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rückschlagventil und Pumpe mit einem solchen Ventil | [2005/28] | English: | Check valve and pump including the same | [2005/28] | French: | Valve non-retour et pompe comprennant cette valve | [2005/28] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5937284 ; | [X]DE1767306 (OMNITECHIC GMBH CHEMISCH TECH) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5205819 (ROSS CALVIN J [GB], et al) [A] 4 * figure 1 ** column 6, line 29 - column 7, line 31 *; | [XY]US5803122 (THEILMEIER THOMAS [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 4 - line 6 * * column 3, line 65 - column 5, line 48 * * figures 3-6 * [Y] 3; | [A]US6048183 (MEZA HUMBERTO [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 5, line 40 - column 7, line 22 * * figures 2,3 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840629), vol. 008, no. 140, Database accession no. (M - 305), & JP59037284 A 19840229 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [Y] 3 * abstract * * figures 5,6 * |