EP1676562 - Composition for the hair containing uv filters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Germany GmbH Pfungstädter Str. 98-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Kao Germany GmbH Pfungstädter Strasse 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Pfungstädter Strasse 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Molenda, Michael Mörfelder Landstrasse 241 60598 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Lateulere, Magali Mühltalstrasse 9c 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
Golinski, Frank Dr. Feldstrasse 13 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2016/09] |
Former [2014/23] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2012/27] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 04029770.7 | 16.12.2004 | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1676562 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1676562 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1676562 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/36, A61K8/362, A61K8/365, A61K8/34, A61Q5/02, A61Q5/12, A61Q17/04 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/365 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2006/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Haarzubereitung enthaltend uv Filter | [2006/27] | English: | Composition for the hair containing uv filters | [2006/27] | French: | Compositions pour les cheveux contenant des filtres uv | [2006/27] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2013
20.01.2016
WITHDRAWN Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
04.04.2013
11.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Dodin, Catherine, et al, et al L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2013
20.01.2016
WITHDRAWN Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
04.04.2013
11.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Dodin, Catherine, et al, et al L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | |||
Former [2013/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2013
19.03.2013
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
04.04.2013
11.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Dodin, Catherine, et al, et al L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | |||
Former [2013/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2013
19.03.2013
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 14.05.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.03.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 15.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.05.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.09.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.01.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 05.08.2015 | Appeal received No. T1545/15 | 03.09.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2004 | AT | 04.07.2012 | BE | 04.07.2012 | CY | 04.07.2012 | CZ | 04.07.2012 | DK | 04.07.2012 | EE | 04.07.2012 | FI | 04.07.2012 | IT | 04.07.2012 | LT | 04.07.2012 | NL | 04.07.2012 | PL | 04.07.2012 | RO | 04.07.2012 | SE | 04.07.2012 | SI | 04.07.2012 | SK | 04.07.2012 | TR | 04.07.2012 | BG | 04.10.2012 | GR | 05.10.2012 | ES | 15.10.2012 | IS | 04.11.2012 | PT | 05.11.2012 | IE | 16.12.2012 | LU | 16.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
TR | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
LU | 16.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
TR | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | SI | 04.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0770399 (SCOTT EUGENE J VAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * example 19; claim - *; | [DA]EP1174112 (KAO CORP [JP]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [X]WO03013456 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,6,10-15 * examples 10,12,20,21,24,25 * | Opposition | WO9520375 | FR2795319 | US2002009423 | DE10219433 | EP1568350 | EP1656967 | - OTTE I., DR. ET AL, Wörterbuch der Kosmetik, STUTTGART, WISSENSCHAFTLICHE VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, (1997), vol. 4, page 204 | - Datasheet Uvinul MS40, April 1999 |