EP1672449 - Apparatus and method for the generation of a collision free path of a grinding tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walter Maschinenbau GmbH Jopestrasse 5 72072 Tübingen / DE | [2013/35] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states Walter Maschinenbau GmbH Derendinger Strasse 53 72072 Tübingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dilger, Christian Hirschstrasse 43 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 02 /
Simakov, Michael 18, Boxshall Street Brighton Vic 3186 / AU | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | ||
Former [2006/25] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a. N. / DE | Application number, filing date | 04029785.5 | 16.12.2004 | [2006/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1672449 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1672449 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4061, B25J9/16 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
G05B19/4061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Erstellung eines kollisionsfreien Weges einer Schleifmaschine | [2006/25] | English: | Apparatus and method for the generation of a collision free path of a grinding tool | [2006/25] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour générer un trajet sans collision pour une ponceuse | [2013/10] |
Former [2006/25] | Dispositif et méthode pour construire un trajet sans collision pour une ponceuse | Examination procedure | 16.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.10.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2004 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | LT | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | NL | 17.07.2013 | PL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | IS | 17.11.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | AT | 16.12.2013 | IE | 16.12.2013 | LU | 16.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
TR | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
AT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
AT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 17.07.2013 | |
PT | 18.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0415067 (MEGAMATION INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 11, line 26 - column 13, line 13 * * column 16, line 27 - column 18, line 15 * * figures 1-11 *; | [A]EP0439655 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 16 * * column 3, line 29 - line 49 * * column 4, line 52 - line 58 * * column 5, line 32 - line 46 * * column 6, line 20 - line 46 * * column 9, line 6 - column 10, line 29 * * figures 1-17 *; | [A]DE19600538 (AGIE AG IND ELEKTRONIK [CH]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 31 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 43 * * column 7, line 18 - line 67 * * column 8, line 57 - line 64 ** figures 1-4 * | Examination | - ADOLPHS P ET AL, "TRANSFORMATION OF OBSTACLES INTO CONFIGURATION SPACE BY USING A SPECIAL LOOK-UP-TABLE FOR COLLISION-FREE ON-LINE PATH-PLANNING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONTROL AND APPLICATIONS. (ICCON) JERUSALEM, APR. 3 - 6, 1989; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONTROL AND APPLICATIONS. (ICCON)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19890403), vol. -, pages WA - 3, XP000090588 | by applicant | EP0415067 | - P. ADOLPHS, G. HÖHN, "Transformation of obstacles into configuration spce by using a specxial look-up table for collisionfree on-line path-planning", ICON 89, (198904), pages 3 - 6 |