EP1555451 - Clutch for mechanical press, scissors or punching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Meer GmbH Ohlerkirchweg 66 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2009/36] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states SMS Eumuco GmbH Josefstrasse 10 51377 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kreisl, Joachim Alte Landstrasse 125 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Gober, Norbert Dhünner Aue 25 51519 Odenthal / DE | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger, et al Gihske Grosse Klüppel Kross Bürogemeinschaft von Patentanwälten Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger, et al Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2005/29] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen, Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 55 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04029923.2 | 17.12.2004 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | DE20041001914 | 14.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004001914 | [2005/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1555451 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1555451 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1555451 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/0635, F16D25/10, F16D67/04 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
F16D25/0635 (EP,US);
F16D25/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Title | German: | Kupplungsvorrichtung für eine mechanische Presse, Schere oder Stanzvorrichtung | [2005/29] | English: | Clutch for mechanical press, scissors or punching device | [2005/29] | French: | Embrayage pour presse mécanique, ciseaux ou dispositif de poinçonnage | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 10.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.09.2009 | DK | 30.09.2009 | EE | 30.09.2009 | FI | 30.09.2009 | IE | 30.09.2009 | LT | 30.09.2009 | NL | 30.09.2009 | PL | 30.09.2009 | RO | 30.09.2009 | SE | 30.09.2009 | SK | 30.09.2009 | TR | 30.09.2009 | AT | 17.12.2009 | LU | 17.12.2009 | GB | 30.12.2009 | BE | 31.12.2009 | BG | 31.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | GR | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | ES | 10.01.2010 | IS | 30.01.2010 | PT | 01.02.2010 | HU | 01.04.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
AT | 17.12.2009 | ||
LU | 17.12.2009 | ||
GB | 30.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
LU | 17.12.2009 | ||
GB | 30.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GB | 30.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GB | 30.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | EE | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | EE | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2924834 (DESCH KG HEINRICH) [AD] 1,7-10 * page 6, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 1; figure . *; | [X]US4784019 (MORSCHECK TIMOTHY J [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,8-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 4 * * column 8, line 33 - line 45 *; | [X]DE4332466 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,6-9 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0797739 (SMS SCHLOEMANN GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]WO0043691 (GKN AUTOMOTIVE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 2; figures 1a,1b * * page 8, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph L; figures 4a,4b * | by applicant | DE2924834 | EP0797739 |