EP1548280 - Piston compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states META MOTOREN- UND ENERGIE-TECHNIK GMBH Kaiserstrasse 100 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [2006/41] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states META Motoren- und Energie-Technik Gmbh Kaiserstrasse 100 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kreuter, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Joseph-Ponten-Strasse 38 52072 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Zoschke, Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Christian-Derichs-Strasse 52 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/26] | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04030336.4 | 21.12.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | DE2003160920 | 23.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10360920 | [2005/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1548280 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1548280 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/02 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
F04B27/02 (EP,US);
F04B27/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | Hubkolbenverdichter | [2005/26] | English: | Piston compressor | [2005/26] | French: | Compresseur à piston | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.10.2006 | CZ | 11.10.2006 | EE | 11.10.2006 | FI | 11.10.2006 | GB | 11.10.2006 | IE | 11.10.2006 | IT | 11.10.2006 | LT | 11.10.2006 | NL | 11.10.2006 | PL | 11.10.2006 | RO | 11.10.2006 | SI | 11.10.2006 | SK | 11.10.2006 | TR | 11.10.2006 | AT | 21.12.2006 | LU | 21.12.2006 | BE | 31.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | BG | 11.01.2007 | DK | 11.01.2007 | SE | 11.01.2007 | GR | 12.01.2007 | ES | 22.01.2007 | IS | 11.02.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | HU | 12.04.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
TR | 11.10.2006 | ||
AT | 21.12.2006 | ||
LU | 21.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IS | 11.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
HU | 12.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
AT | 21.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IS | 11.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
HU | 12.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
AT | 21.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IS | 11.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
AT | 21.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IS | 11.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
AT | 21.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IS | 11.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IS | 11.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IS | 11.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IS | 11.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IS | 11.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
LT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IS | 11.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 11.10.2006 | |
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IS | 11.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/15] | SI | 11.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4486157 (HAYASHI YOSHIMASA [JP]) [X] 1-13 * abstract *; | [X]US5219273 (CHANG ROY Y [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract *; | [X]WO03087577 (UNICLA J KK [JP], et al) [X] 1* abstract * |