EP1674063 - Extensible side panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M General Offices St. Paul, P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petersen, Johann Leipziger Strasse 15 41516 Grevenbroich / DE | 02 /
Selen, Peter Venloseweg 1A 5993 PG Maasbree / NL | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Wilhelm, Stefan, et al 3M Deutschland GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Wilhelm, Stefan, et al 3M Deutschland GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | ||
Former [2006/26] | Wilhelm, Stefan, et al Office of Intellectual Property Counsel, c/o 3M Deutschland GmbH, Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 04030578.1 | 23.12.2004 | [2006/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1674063 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
A61F13/4902 (EP,US);
A61F13/15747 (EP,US);
A61F13/15756 (EP,US);
A61F13/49014 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1051 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24008 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24777 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elastische Seitenwand | [2006/26] | English: | Extensible side panel | [2006/26] | French: | Pannel lateral elasitcisé | [2006/26] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/40] | 18.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.01.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9513775 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-21 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 14, paragraph 2 - page 20, paragraph 2 * * page 28, paragraph 2 - page 29, paragraph 2 * * page 32, paragraph 2 - page 34, paragraph 1; figures 1-12 *; | [X]US5683533 (KEIGHLEY JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 3, line 28 - column 6, line 58; figures 1-6 * * column 8, line 31 - column 11, line 17 *; | [X]WO9747265 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-14* page 4, line 11 - page 15, line 30; figure - * |