EP1551192 - Method for transmitting a message of a mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cha, Dal-Yong Gwanak-prugio Apt. 121-1801 Bongcheon 3-Dong Gwanak-Gu Seoul / KR | [2005/35] |
Former [2005/27] | 01 /
Cha, Dal-Yong Gwanak-prugio Apt. 121-181 Bongcheon 3-Dong Gwanak-Gu Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Katérle, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/27] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04030685.4 | 23.12.2004 | [2005/27] | Priority number, date | KR20030100732 | 30.12.2003 Original published format: KR 2003100732 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1551192 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1551192 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32, H04M1/02 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
H04M1/0245 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
H04M1/663 (EP,US);
H04W4/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übertragung einer Nachricht eines Endgeräts | [2008/10] | English: | Method for transmitting a message of a mobile terminal | [2005/27] | French: | Procédé de transmission d'un message d'un terminal mobile | [2005/27] |
Former [2005/27] | Verfahren zum Ubertragung einer Nachricht eines Endgeräts | Examination procedure | 16.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 23.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07001014.5 / EP1791379 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.08.2008 | BE | 27.08.2008 | CY | 27.08.2008 | CZ | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | EE | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | LT | 27.08.2008 | PL | 27.08.2008 | RO | 27.08.2008 | SI | 27.08.2008 | SK | 27.08.2008 | TR | 27.08.2008 | BG | 27.11.2008 | SE | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | ES | 08.12.2008 | IE | 23.12.2008 | LU | 23.12.2008 | IS | 27.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | PT | 27.01.2009 | HU | 28.02.2009 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CY | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
TR | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
LU | 23.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CY | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
LU | 23.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
LU | 23.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IE | 23.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 27.08.2008 | |
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02082786 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-30; | [A]WO03010983 (ERICSSON INC [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 2, line 21 - line 32 * * claim 11 *; | [A]EP1365607 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0036] *; | EP1385318 [ ] (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0024] * |