EP1635190 - Method and device for distance measurement by pulse radar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | For all designated states FUJITSU TEN LIMITED 2-28 Gosho-dori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 652-8510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
For all designated states FUJITSU TEN LIMITED 2-28 Gosho-dori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 652-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moriya, Masayoshi, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211- 8588 / JP | 02 /
Ishii, Satoshi, c/o Fujitso Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211- 8588 / JP | 03 /
Seki, Tetsuo, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211- 8588 / JP | 04 /
Hamada, Kazuaki, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211- 8588 / JP | 05 /
Oka, Kenji, c/o Fujitsu Ten Limited 2-28, Gosho-dori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-8510 / JP | 06 /
Ohta, Akihiro, c/o Fujitsu Ten Limited 2-28, Gosho-dori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-8510 / JP | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Seeger, Wolfgang Seeger & Seeger Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Seeger, Wolfgang Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04030746.4 | 24.12.2004 | [2006/11] | Priority number, date | JP20040261479 | 08.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004261479 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1635190 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1635190 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/93, G01S13/22, G01S13/24, G01S13/18 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
G01S13/20 (EP,US);
B09B3/40 (KR);
B01F27/05 (KR);
G01K7/00 (KR);
G01S13/18 (EP,US);
G01S13/227 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/47] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Entfernungsmessung mit einem Pulsradar | [2006/11] | English: | Method and device for distance measurement by pulse radar | [2006/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour mesure de distance par radar à impulsions | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2000111639 ; | [DA]JPS61133885 ; | [X]EP0184424 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 4-6 * * page 7, line 23 - page 10, line 3 *; | [A]US4973968 (HURD DAVID L [GB]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 43 *; | [A]GB2335103 (DECCA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US6111537 (ANDERSSON BENGT [SE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [A]US6639546 (OTT DAVID RONALD [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 4, line 18 * * figures 1,2 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000111639 A 20000421 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [DA] 1-10 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861107), vol. 010, no. 327, Database accession no. (P - 513), & JP61133885 A 19860621 (NEC CORP) [DA] 1-10 * abstract * |