EP1555436 - Gear pump with flow control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nissen, Harry Brauergildenstrasse 7 38300 Wolfenbüttel / DE | 02 /
Gebauer, Klaus Zickerickstrasse 7 b 38304 Wolfenbüttel / DE | 03 /
Hartung, Henry Am Queckenberg 30 b 38120 Braunschweig / DE | 04 /
Janke, André Amselfeld 31 38179 Gross Schwülper / DE | [2005/29] | Application number, filing date | 04030757.1 | 24.12.2004 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | DE20041002062 | 15.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004002062 | [2005/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1555436 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1555436 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1555436 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F04C14/18, F04C2/18 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
F04C14/185 (EP);
F04C2/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/29] | F04C15/04, F04C2/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Title | German: | Zahnradpumpe mit Fördermengenregelung | [2005/29] | English: | Gear pump with flow control | [2005/29] | French: | Pompe à engrenages avec contrôle de débit | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 19.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.08.2007 | CZ | 15.08.2007 | DK | 15.08.2007 | EE | 15.08.2007 | FI | 15.08.2007 | GB | 15.08.2007 | IE | 15.08.2007 | LT | 15.08.2007 | NL | 15.08.2007 | PL | 15.08.2007 | RO | 15.08.2007 | SI | 15.08.2007 | SK | 15.08.2007 | TR | 15.08.2007 | BG | 15.11.2007 | SE | 15.11.2007 | GR | 16.11.2007 | ES | 26.11.2007 | IS | 15.12.2007 | AT | 24.12.2007 | LU | 24.12.2007 | BE | 31.12.2007 | FR | 31.12.2007 | IT | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | PT | 15.01.2008 | HU | 16.02.2008 | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/44] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
AT | 24.12.2007 | ||
LU | 24.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
HU | 16.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
AT | 24.12.2007 | ||
LU | 24.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
AT | 24.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
AT | 24.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
AT | 24.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
AT | 24.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 15.08.2007 | |
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 15.08.2007 | |
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | LT | 15.08.2007 | |
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 15.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1553234 (TUCHENHAGEN OTTO) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]DE3347015 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-6 * page 9 - page 11; figure . *; | [AD]DE10043842 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE10144693 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document * |