EP1437456 - Packaged set of floor panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/29] | Floor covering, floor panel and set of floor panels for forming such floor covering, and methods for packaging and manufacturing such floor panels | ||
[2009/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flooring Industries Ltd. West Block, IFSC Dublin 1 / IE | [2010/24] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Flooring Industries Ltd. West Block, IFSC Dublin 1 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thiers, Bernard Paul Joseph Nestor de Tièrestraat 128 B-9700 Eine / BE | 02 /
De Boe, Lode Hubert Lieven Talpensdreef 1 8890 Moorslede / BE | 03 /
Vanhastel, Luc Dirk Daniël Felix D'Hoopstraat 88 8700 Tielt / BE | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
Thiers, Bernard Paul Joseph Nestor de Tièrestraat 128 B-9700 Eine / BE | ||
02 /
De Boe, Lode Hubert Lieven Talpensdreef 1 8890 Moorslede / BE | |||
03 /
Vanhastel, Luc Dirk Daniel Felix D'hoopstraat 88 8700 Tielt / BE | |||
Former [2004/29] | 01 /
Thiers, Bernard Paul Joseph Stationsstraat 134 8780 Oostrozebeke / BE | ||
02 /
De Boe, Lode Hubert Lieven Talpensdreef 1 8890 Moorslede / BE | |||
03 /
Vanhastel, Luc Dirk Daniel Felix D'hoopstraat 88 8700 Tielt / BE | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 04075032.5 | 06.01.2004 | [2004/29] | Priority number, date | BE20030000020 | 09.01.2003 Original published format: BE 200300020 | US20030438781P | 09.01.2003 Original published format: US 438781 P | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1437456 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1437456 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
B44C5/0469 (EP,US);
B27M3/04 (EP,US);
B44F9/02 (EP,US);
E04F15/02 (EP,US);
B65D85/62 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0115 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/29] | Title | German: | Verpackter Satz von Fussbodenpaneelen | [2009/48] | English: | Packaged set of floor panels | [2009/48] | French: | Ensemble de panneaux de plancher emballé | [2009/48] |
Former [2004/29] | Fussbodenbelag, Fussbodenpaneel und Satz von Paneelen für solchen Fussbodenbelag und Verfahren zur Verpackung und zur Herstellung solcher Fussbodenpaneelen | ||
Former [2004/29] | Floor covering, floor panel and set of floor panels for forming such floor covering, and methods for packaging and manufacturing such floor panels | ||
Former [2004/29] | Revêtement de plancher, panneau de plancher et jeu de panneaux pour un tel revêtement de plancher et procédés de conditionnement et de fabrication de ces panneaux de plancher | Examination procedure | 25.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 30.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.06.2010 | DK | 16.06.2010 | EE | 16.06.2010 | FI | 16.06.2010 | SI | 16.06.2010 | BG | 16.09.2010 | GR | 17.09.2010 | PT | 18.10.2010 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2011/42] | CY | 16.06.2010 | |
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 16.06.2010 | |
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CY | 16.06.2010 | |
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | CY | 16.06.2010 | |
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 16.06.2010 | |
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 16.06.2010 | |
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | FI | 16.06.2010 | |
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | FI | 16.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]US4471012 (MAXWELL THOMAS V [US]) [DX] 1-3,5,6,8,13,14,20 * column 1, line 43 - column 1, line 63 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 7,10-12,15-17,19,21-23; | [DXY]US4538392 (HAMAR EDWARD K [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,4,6,9,13,14 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 27 * * column 3, line 12 - column 3, line 30 * * figures 1-5,12,13; claim 1 * [Y] 7,10-12,15,16,19; | [DYA]US5113632 (HANSON RONALD A [US]) [DY] 15-17,19 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 11 * * figures 1,4,5; claim 1 * [A] 18; | [Y]EP1024234 (UNILIN BEHEER BV [NL]) [Y] 7,10-12,21,23 * column 9, line 18 - column 9, line 52 * * column 13, line 40 - column 14, line 23 * * figures 1-12 *; | [Y]US2002014047 (THIERS BERNARD PAUL JOSEPH [BE]) [Y] 11,12,21-23 * page 1, paragraph 10 - page 1, paragraph 15 * * column 2, paragraph 28 * * column 4, paragraph 63 * * figures 1-14 *; | [A]WO0225004 (INTERFACE INC [US], et al) [A] 18 * page 4, line 21 - page 4, line 23 ** figure 5 *; | [PX]EP1308577 (E F P FLOOR PROD FUSSBOEDEN [AT]) [PX] 1,5-8,13,14,20 * column 1, line 3 - column 1, line 25 * * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 57 * * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, line 32 - column 5, line 52 * * figures 1-4 * | Examination | US753791 | WO9747834 | WO0196688 | WO03089736 | by applicant | US753791 | US4471012 | US4538392 | US5113632 |